Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 845 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4358 Week
» 24651 Month
» 202555 Year
» 1867931 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7150 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77150 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90142 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25021
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 12/12/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
FEL   Feltham (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 18/11/1947
HIT   Hither Green 5w/e 04/02/1950
27B   Aintree w/e 09/06/1951
27B   Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/08/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 19/06/1954
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 26/02/1955
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
26B   Agecroft w/e 06/05/1961
40B   Immingham w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 12/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN FEL Feltham on 18/11/1947
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 5w/e 06/05/1961
ALLOC 40B Immingham 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   w/e 12/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Brighton Works Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. SLS/194710
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
05/05/1951 Brighton Works 42093 nearly finished by 5th May, 42094/5 an 80010-3 in various stages. 80010 is due out during the latter half of June, the next three being due in July. 2009 has been cut up and 32022 an 2062 are being dealt with next, followed by 2063 an 2068. All the 2-8-0 rernaining on SR register are re-numbered with the exception of 77150 (73C). . SLS/195106
12/05/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 31225/70/91/335/542/620/34/81/8/763, 31814/34/67/9,5/6, 33008/19, 90142. To be cut up: 31697, (3)1093, (3)1379, 31494, 31509, 31731, 31595, 31743, 31710. New: Diesels 15229/30. SLS/195107
20/05/1951 Locos renumbered S.R. 2170 was renumbered 32170 in mid-May, and diesel sl will shortly be turned out as 15201. Thus the S.R. diesels have become 15201-15203 instead of 15200-15202 as originally ordained. The Southern Region has lost two more W.D., 2-8-0 to the L.M.R., 90226 from 73B and 90390 from 73C. No. 77150 has now become 90142, so that all remaining on the S.R. are now renumbered with the possible exception of 77226 (90194). SLS/195107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7150
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25021
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77150    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90142    
09/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
06/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90142    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev