Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 793 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4306 Week
» 24599 Month
» 202503 Year
» 1867879 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7151 on 25/05/1943
War Dept. 77151 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90143 on 30/03/1949 (At Scotswood)

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25022
To Service Sat 25/05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/05/1964
Service Life 21 yrs , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1964 at Connels (Calder)

Notes
Notes Received at Swindon ex Dover on 13th August 1946

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/05/1943
OXY   Oxley (on loan) on 13/09/1946
BHD   Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 30/04/1948
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 02/12/1950
24B   Rose Grove m/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 30/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 30/09/1946
ALLOC BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 30/04/1948
LOAN 24B Rose Grove m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   w/e 30/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7151
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25022
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77151    
13/09/1946 Allocation Loaned to Oxley (OXY)    
30/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD)    
30/03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90143    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
30/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90143    
09/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Connels: Calder    

prev prev