Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 841 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4354 Week
» 24647 Month
» 202551 Year
» 1867927 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7152 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77152 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90144 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25023
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal During 12/1963
Service Life 20 yrs , 7 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 14/11/1947
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
31B   March 5w/e 24/03/1956
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 16/03/1957
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 14/11/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   on 14/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7152
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25023
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77152    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90144    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90144    
03/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev