Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4301 Week
» 24594 Month
» 202498 Year
» 1867874 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7155 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77155 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90145 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25026
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Tue 23/06/1964
Service Life 21 yrs , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
31B   March w/e 17/02/1952
31B   March 4w/e 22/03/1952
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
41D   Canklow w/e 12/09/1959
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 29/04/1961
     Withdrawn on 23/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 06/08/1947
ALLOC 31B March w/e 17/02/1952
ALLOC 31B March on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 13/05/1961
WDN   on 23/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1954 York Area The Holbeck (20A) turn to Scarborough mentioned in last month's notes has brought most of the Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's from Holbeck into York on various occasions; 73045 also appears frequently. 44810 (21A) appeared on it on 6/3/54. 44780 (25B) was under repair in York shed on 12/2/54. 61131 (37A) worked the 9.22 a.m. York to King's Cross as far as Doncaster on 12/2/54 instead of the customary Doncaster A3 or V2. 61131 returned to York at 1.26 p.m. on the 7.20 a.m. from Colchester. This latter train is normally hauled by a Doncaster B1, although V2's from New England are occasionally used instead. Two Scottish Region A3's called at York shed recently, returning north after overhaul at Doncaster Works, namely 60100 (64B) on 19/2/54 and 60095 (68E) on 3/3/54. 46465 (31A) was at York shed on 12/3/54, returning, to Cambridge after overhaul at Darlington Works. On 24/2/54 90145 (40B) arrived at York from the Hull via Market Weighton line hauling 69094 (53A) for Darlington Works. 67739 (32B) was also at York shed on the same date en route for Darlington Works in a very dilapidated condition.
Pantomime excursions to Leeds were run on 2/3/54 from both Scarborough and Kirbymoorside. One of the two Scarborough trains called at Weaverthorpe, Rillington, Strensall and Haxby stations, which have been closed to regular passenger traffic for many years. The excursion from Kirbymoorside called at Nawton, Helmsley, Gilling and Coxwold (closed early in 1953).
SLS/195404

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7155
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25026
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77155    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90145    
17/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
29/04/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
23/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90145    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev