Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 777 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2458 Week
» 22751 Month
» 200655 Year
» 1866031 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7157 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77157 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90146 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25028
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 13/06/1965
Service Life 22 yrs , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 14/11/1947
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
34E   New England w/e 07/05/1960
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 13/04/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 13/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 14/11/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 3w/e 27/04/1963
WDN   w/e 13/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7157
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25028
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77157    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90146    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
13/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
13/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90146    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev