Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 780 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4293 Week
» 24586 Month
» 202490 Year
» 1867866 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7160 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77160 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90147 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25031
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs , 10 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
25D   Mirfield w/e 21/10/1950
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
6B   Mold Junction 8w/e 14/06/1952
5C   Stafford w/e 27/02/1960
6B   Mold Junction w/e 21/05/1960
8D   Widnes w/e 28/04/1962
9G   Gorton w/e 23/03/1963
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 01/06/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 06/07/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 21/10/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
LOAN 5C Stafford 4w/e 27/02/1960
EXLOAN 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 28/05/1960
ALLOC 8D Widnes 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7160
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25031
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77160    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90147    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford (5C)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
28/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
23/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90147    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev