Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 817 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2498 Week
» 22791 Month
» 200695 Year
» 1866071 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7161 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77161 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90148 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25032
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/03/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
83A   Newton Abbot 2w/e 12/07/1952
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/04/1954
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
84C   Banbury 4w/e 22/03/1958
85C   Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 30/12/1961
84F   Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) on 15/07/1962
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 13/03/1965
10H   Lower Darwen w/e 24/04/1965
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/06/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 09/10/1965
36C   Frodingham w/e 01/01/1966
36A   Doncaster w/e 05/03/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 27/03/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN LA Laira m/e 28/02/1947
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 85C Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 30/12/1961
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 04/08/1962
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 3w/e 01/01/1966
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 12/03/1966
WDN   w/e 27/03/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1943 Crewe Works Engines in shops on 2/11: 2587, 3891, 4220, 4464/99, 5026/76/94, 5109/31/89, 5201/33/96, 5357, 5423/33/56, 5526/41/2/54/63/91/6, 5605/19/56/62, 6117/34/9/42/8/63, 6200/2/9/31/5/40, 6931, 7340, 7408/68, 7674, 7772, 7898,.7978/9, 8598, 8962, 9057/83, 9103/23, 9305/40/1/66, 9529, 9605/6/20/32, 28245, 28423, 28616. W.D. 7057 (V.F.4873/43), W.D. 7161 (N.B.L. 25032/43). U.S.A. 1681 (Baldwin 67665, 1/43); U.S.A. 2400 (A.L.Co. 70749, 4/43), U.S.A. 2428 (A.L.Co. 70777, 5/43). The next 'Scot' to be 'rebuilt' is No, 6124. No. 6117 should be out 1/12/43. New 8.F. No. 8310 left the erecting shop 30/11/43. The W.D. (Austerity) 2-8-0's are having their cast-iron tender wheels re-placed by steel castings at Crewe. W.D. Nos. 551, 559, 571 are being returned to L.M.S. service, and the following running numbers have been allocated:-551/8266, NBL 24746/42, Tender No. 9993/43; 559/8272, NBL 24770J42; 571/8284 NBL 24806/42. Allocation of some '8.F's'-12A, Nos. 8302/3/32, 8644/51; 16C, Nos. 8616/41; 18B, Nos. 8304/33, 8620/1/50; 18D, No. 8642; 20A, Nos. 8305, 8618/39/40; 20B, No. 8619; 28C, Nos. 8617/43/52-4. SLS/194401
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
31/01/1958 Shrewsbury MPD The following locomotives are in store here-43760, 49243/60/424 and WD's 90148/716. SLS/195803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7161
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25032
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77161    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90148    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (85C)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
15/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
24/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/03/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90148    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev