Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 833 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4346 Week
» 24639 Month
» 202543 Year
» 1867919 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7163 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77163 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90150 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25034
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 05/11/1947
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
31B   March 5w/e 24/03/1956
36A   Doncaster w/e 07/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 05/11/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   on 16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7163
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25034
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77163    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90150    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90150    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev