Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 753 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2434 Week
» 22727 Month
» 200631 Year
» 1866007 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7166 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77166 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90153 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25037
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Thu 10/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 24/11/1947
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
41F   Mexborough 4w/e 19/07/1958
41D   Canklow w/e 08/12/1962
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 10/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 24/11/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   on 10/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7166
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25037
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77166    
10/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90153    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
10/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90153    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev