Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 827 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4340 Week
» 24633 Month
» 202537 Year
» 1867913 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7167 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77167 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90154 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25038
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
MEX   Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
38A   Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
34E   New England w/e 12/12/1959
36A   Doncaster w/e 28/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 11/03/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead on 13/04/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7167
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25038
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77167    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90154    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90154    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev