Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 824 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4337 Week
» 24630 Month
» 202534 Year
» 1867910 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7169 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77169 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90155 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25040
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Mon 09/01/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1967 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
51A   Darlington w/e 20/06/1959
56A   Wakefield w/e 26/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 09/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 14/07/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   on 09/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1945 Calais MPD 77032 an 77169 were noted at Calais shed in December, painted in the Nord red-brown and lined out in scarlet. SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7169
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25040
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77169    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90155    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
09/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90155    
05/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev