Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 824 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4337 Week
» 24630 Month
» 202534 Year
» 1867910 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7170 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77170 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90156 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25041
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
NWE   New England w/e 13/08/1949
35C   Spital Bridge 4w/e 19/12/1953
35A   New England 5w/e 24/03/1956
31B   March 4w/e 14/12/1957
30A   Stratford w/e 18/04/1959
34B   Hornsey w/e 30/04/1960
36A   Doncaster w/e 17/06/1961
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill on 22/05/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 35C Spital Bridge 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 35A New England 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7170
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25041
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77170    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90156    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90156    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev