Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7171 m/e 06/1943
War Dept. 77171 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90157 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25042
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/07/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1943
25A   Wakefield w/e 02/07/1949
25A   Wakefield 5w/e 16/07/1949
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
38D   Staveley (G.C.) on 18/02/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 5w/e 24/03/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
6B   Mold Junction 8w/e 14/06/1952
8D   Widnes w/e 25/07/1959
12H   Tebay w/e 25/03/1961
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 16/06/1962
8D   Widnes w/e 15/09/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/03/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 04/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24A Accrington w/e 07/05/1949
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 02/07/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) on 18/02/1951
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 8D Widnes 8w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 12H Tebay 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 8D Widnes 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 30/03/1963
WDN   w/e 04/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7171
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25042
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77171    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90157    
02/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
18/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (12H)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
23/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
04/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90157    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev