Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 861 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4374 Week
» 24667 Month
» 202571 Year
» 1867947 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7173 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77173 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90158 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25044
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at W George, Station Steel (Wath)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
MAR   March (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 24/11/1947
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 09/11/1963
36A   Doncaster w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 24/11/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 25/11/1963
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7173
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25044
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77173    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90158    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90158    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by W George, Station Steel: Wath    

prev prev