Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7174 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77174 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90159 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25045
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/11/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Butlers (Otley)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
     Withdrawn w/e 16/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 20/03/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 05/02/1949
WDN   w/e 16/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1948 \"Austerity\" Detail alterations 2-8-0's Nos. 77120, 77174 an 77461 have been noted fitted with Gresley-type snifting valves SLS/194810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7174
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25045
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77174    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90159    
16/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90159    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Butlers: Otley    

prev prev