Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 853 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 22827 Month
» 200731 Year
» 1866107 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7175 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77175 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90160 on 09/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25046
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Thu 08/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Wed 28/02/1968 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
HLS   Hull Springhead w/e 15/05/1948
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 25/11/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates m/e 30/11/1950
50D   Goole w/e 13/02/1960
56A   Wakefield w/e 25/07/1964
     Withdrawn on 08/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK ANN Annesley on 13/02/1947
ALLOC BRN Barnsley on 27/04/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 05/10/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 53E Goole 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   on 08/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7175
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25046
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77175    
15/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
09/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90160    
13/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
08/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90160    
28/02/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev