Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1544 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19347 Week
» 72363 Month
» 191890 Year
» 3218743 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7176 |
m/e |
07/1943 |
War Dept. |
77176 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90161 |
m/e |
08/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MEX |
Mexborough |
on |
08/11/1947 |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
16/04/1960 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/02/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7176 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25047 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77176 |
|
|
08/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Mexborough (MEX) (On loan from War Department) |
|
|
08/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90161 |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (86K) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
16/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
15/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
07/02/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90161 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|