Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 810 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4323 Week
» 24616 Month
» 202520 Year
» 1867896 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7178 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77178 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90162 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25049
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Mon 24/02/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 7 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
IMM   Immingham w/e 12/06/1948
35A   New England 5w/e 24/03/1951
35A   New England m/e 31/03/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/07/1953
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 22/01/1955
41D   Canklow w/e 20/06/1959
40B   Immingham w/e 12/09/1959
41D   Canklow w/e 09/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 24/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 30/09/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 35A New England m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 24/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906
28/11/1953 Darlington Works North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. SLS/195402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7178
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25049
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77178    
12/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90162    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
24/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90162    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev