Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 159 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3672 Week
» 23965 Month
» 201869 Year
» 1867245 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7182 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77182 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90166 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25053
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/05/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 13/11/1947
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
40B   Immingham w/e 16/04/1960
36C   Frodingham w/e 15/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 09/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 13/11/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 09/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7182
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25053
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77182    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90166    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
09/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90166    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev