Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 839 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2520 Week
» 22813 Month
» 200717 Year
» 1866093 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7184 m/e 07/1943
War Dept. 77184 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90167 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25055
To Service During 07/1943
Withdrawal Thu 29/03/1962 (At Crewe Works)
Withdrawal Notes At Crewe Works
Service Life 18 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1962 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1943
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 17/06/1950
86G   Pontypool Road w/e 31/12/1950
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 31/01/1951
87G   Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
86C   Hereford 4w/e 10/09/1960
     Withdrawn on 29/03/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN PDN Old Oak Common m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 17/06/1950
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 10/09/1960
WDN   m/e 31/03/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708
29/02/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender SLS/194804
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206
19/04/1958 Carmarthen MPD W.D. 2-8-0's 90167/79/207/485/529 have been allocated to replace the remaining R.O.D's as they are withdrawn. SLS/195805
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Works Yard) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7184
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25055
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77184    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90167    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
29/03/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90167    
05/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev