Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 846 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4359 Week
» 24652 Month
» 202556 Year
» 1867932 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7186 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77186 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90169 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25057
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 22/08/1965
Service Life 22 yrs , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
87G   Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
40E   Colwick w/e 23/06/1962
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/09/1963
36A   Doncaster w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 22/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 31/07/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 23/06/1962
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 22/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7186
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25057
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77186    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90169    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90169    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev