Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 54 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4969 Week
» 16206 Month
» 249126 Year
» 1914502 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7187 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77187 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90170 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25058
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
68A   Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 12/06/1954
21B   Bescot w/e 03/09/1960
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 10/09/1960
26B   Agecroft w/e 08/06/1963
     Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 15/03/1947
ALLOC 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 15/05/1954
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 5w/e 06/07/1963
WDN   w/e 03/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7187
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25058
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77187    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90170    
12/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
03/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90170    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by W.E.Smiths: Ecclesfield    

prev prev