Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 790 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2471 Week
» 22764 Month
» 200668 Year
» 1866044 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7192 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77192 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90171 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25063
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/07/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
24A   Accrington w/e 29/10/1949
24B   Rose Grove w/e 03/12/1949
24B   Rose Grove 5w/e 24/12/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 03/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 29/10/1949
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove w/e 03/12/1949
WDN   w/e 03/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7192
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25063
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77192    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90171    
29/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
03/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90171    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev