Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 146 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3659 Week
» 23952 Month
» 201856 Year
» 1867232 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7195 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77195 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90172 on 18/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25066
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
51A   Darlington w/e 20/06/1959
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 16/03/1963
51A   Darlington w/e 29/06/1963
50B   Hull Dairycoates w/e 31/08/1963
50D   Goole w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK YK York (North) on 14/04/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton on 27/07/1947
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 02/03/1963
LOAN 66A Polmadie 4w/e 06/03/1963
EXLOAN 51A Darlington 4w/e 06/07/1963
EXLOAN 91NE   5w/e 13/07/1963
ALLOC 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 07/09/1963
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/12/1948 Darlington Works Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103.
Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329.
SLS/194901

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7195
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25066
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77195    
18/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90172    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90172    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev