Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 31 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4658 Week
» 6396 Month
» 133839 Year
» 1799215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7196 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77196 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90173 m/e 07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25067
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/07/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
26A   Newton Heath on 06/01/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 27/01/1951
26A   Newton Heath m/e 31/01/1951
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 04/12/1954
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 25/02/1956
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/04/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/07/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 11/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN LA Laira m/e 31/03/1947
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath on 06/01/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath m/e 31/01/1951
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 25/12/1954
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 03/08/1963
WDN   w/e 11/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during February included: 2933, 2938, 2979, 2981, 3024, 3029, 3030, 3407, 3449, 3588, 4018, 4052, 4060, 4061, 4083, 4093, 4320, 5042, 5054, 5305, 5341, 5367, 6312, 6320, 6338, 6340, 6374, W.D. 70843, 77196, 77288, 78632, and 79234. Works' pilots during the same period included: 1796, 2044, and 2077. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are: 3758, 3789, 5760, 7777, 8776 and 9771. 2891 and 3804 have both been fitted with side windows, side sheets and doors between engine and tender sides. SLS/194704
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Paint Shop) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7196
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25067
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77196    
06/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
07/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90173    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
25/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
11/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90173    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev