Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 719 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6119 Week
» 24171 Month
» 257091 Year
» 1922467 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7198 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77198 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90174 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25069
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
81C   Southall 4w/e 14/06/1952
81C   Southall 6w/e 30/06/1952
     Withdrawn on 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 02/09/1947
LOAN 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 04/11/1951
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   on 12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7198
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25069
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77198    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90174    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90174    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev