Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 824 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2505 Week
» 22798 Month
» 200702 Year
» 1866078 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7202 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77202 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90178 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25073
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 6 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
6B   Mold Junction 8w/e 14/06/1952
8D   Widnes w/e 25/07/1959
24L   Carnforth w/e 06/02/1960
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 17/09/1960
36C   Frodingham w/e 29/05/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/03/1947
LOAN 24D Lower Darwen on 09/05/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Paint Shop Yard) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7202
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25073
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77202    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90178    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90178    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev