Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 782 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2463 Week
» 22756 Month
» 200660 Year
» 1866036 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7203 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77203 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90179 m/e 02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25074
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
85A   Worcester 4w/e 30/04/1951
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 3w/e 17/05/1952
86G   Pontypool Road 4w/e 21/03/1953
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/01/1955
85A   Worcester 4w/e 13/07/1957
87F   Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
9G   Gorton on 20/05/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN WOS Worcester m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC GLO Gloucester Horton Road m/e 31/07/1947
ALLOC 85A Worcester m/e 30/04/1951
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 09/10/1954
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   w/e 25/04/1964
WDN   w/e 25/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
19/04/1958 Carmarthen MPD W.D. 2-8-0's 90167/79/207/485/529 have been allocated to replace the remaining R.O.D's as they are withdrawn. SLS/195805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7203
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25074
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77203    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
02/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90179    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G)    
01/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
20/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90179    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev prev