Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 839 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4352 Week
» 24645 Month
» 202549 Year
» 1867925 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7204 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77204 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90180 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25075
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
40B   Immingham w/e 29/09/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 14/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 07/03/1947
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 14/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7204
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25075
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77204    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90180    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
14/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90180    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev