Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 775 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2456 Week
» 22749 Month
» 200653 Year
» 1866029 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7205 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77205 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90181 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25076
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/05/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
25B   Huddersfield Hillhouse 2w/e 17/06/1950
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 23/02/1952
24B   Rose Grove 4w/e 08/08/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 08/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 08/08/1953
WDN   w/e 08/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7205
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25076
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77205    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90181    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
08/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90181    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev