Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 779 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4292 Week
» 24585 Month
» 202489 Year
» 1867865 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7207 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77207 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90183 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25078
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 29/08/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
26F   Patricroft w/e 23/01/1960
26A   Newton Heath w/e 12/01/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/12/1963
36C   Frodingham w/e 29/05/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 29/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK STM St Margarets on 29/01/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove on 20/01/1949
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 29/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7207
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25078
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77207    
12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90183    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
29/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
29/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90183    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev