Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 817 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2498 Week
» 22791 Month
» 200695 Year
» 1866071 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7208 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77208 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90184 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25079
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Mon 05/10/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
51A   Darlington w/e 20/06/1959
56D   Mirfield w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 05/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 14/07/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton on 05/10/1947
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7208
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25079
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77208    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90184    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
05/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90184    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev