Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 886 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 1904 Week
» 2843 Month
» 206333 Year
» 1871709 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7209 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77209 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90185 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25080
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
WFD   Woodford Halse w/e 14/01/1950
CLK   Colwick w/e 28/01/1950
38E   Woodford Halse w/e 18/03/1950
38A   Colwick on 22/10/1950
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
34E   New England w/e 07/05/1960
40B   Immingham w/e 29/09/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 14/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 22/09/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 18/03/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick on 22/10/1950
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 14/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7209
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25080
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77209    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
22/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90185    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
14/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90185    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev