Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 764 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2445 Week
» 22738 Month
» 200642 Year
» 1866018 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7210 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77210 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90186 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25081
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Thu 22/08/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 02/12/1950
25C   Goole 8w/e 29/11/1952
     Withdrawn on 22/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NA Newton Abbot m/e 30/04/1947
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   on 22/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7210
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25081
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77210    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90186    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
22/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90186    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev