Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 757 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2438 Week
» 22731 Month
» 200635 Year
» 1866011 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7212 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77212 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90187 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25083
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
38E   Woodford Halse w/e 06/10/1951
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/10/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 27/10/1951
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
6B   Mold Junction 8w/e 14/06/1952
24L   Carnforth w/e 25/03/1961
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 21/12/1963
10A   Carnforth w/e 18/04/1964
8G   Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 25/04/1964
10H   Lower Darwen w/e 13/06/1964
40E   Colwick w/e 12/06/1965
36A   Doncaster w/e 01/01/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 27/10/1951
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 01/04/1961
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 40E Colwick 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7212
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25083
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77212    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90187    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
27/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G)    
13/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90187    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev