Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 768 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4281 Week
» 24574 Month
» 202478 Year
» 1867854 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7214 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77214 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90188 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25085
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
86C   Cardiff Canton m/e 28/02/1951
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/03/1951
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 16/06/1951
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 6w/e 30/06/1951
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/08/1951
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/08/1951
84C   Banbury 4w/e 05/11/1960
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/12/1960
41F   Mexborough on 02/12/1962
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 25/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/03/1947
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 05/11/1960
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region on 02/12/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 2w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
26/11/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D10, D132-4, 44695, 45101/90, 45200, 45617/74, 45702, 48605, 49395, 78042. Paint Shop Yard: D135, 42213, 44697, 44757, 45608, 45710, 46130, 48252, 48476, 50850, 70048. New Erecting Shop: D1/3/9, D136/7, D214/31, D5140. Erecting Shop: D50-8, D290, 41251, 42148, 42224/55, 42440, 42571, 42679, 44690, 44942-4/89, 45046/92, 45145, 45256/90, 45301/37/86, 45424/93, 45543/52, 45695, 45709, 46133, 46224/53, 46506, 48130, 48399, 48408/45, 48532, 48638/49, 48700/3/36/62, 49130, 49361, 70042, 90188, 90365, 92017/76/82, 92125. Erecting Shop Yard: 42287/94, 44765, 44965, 45186/97, 45719, 46141. Minor Repair Road: 44753, 45646, 92025. Works Sidings: 44746/81, 44887, 45026/42, 45680, 46109, 47255, 47403/5, 48215, 48500/28/51, 78035, 90675, 92016/8, 92163. Scrap Road: 42545, 45401 just cut up, 45630 being cut up, 40033/4/8/64, 40569, 42217, 42467, 42549, 42683, 48927, 49401/53 intact. Works Shunters: 13292, 44374, 51412/46, 47592, 47608/61, 52093, 52218, 52441/59. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7214
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25085
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77214    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90188    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
31/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
31/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
02/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90188    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev