Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 809 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2490 Week
» 22783 Month
» 200687 Year
» 1866063 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7215 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77215 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90189 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25086
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/11/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
36C   Frodingham w/e 20/02/1960
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 11/01/1964
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 09/10/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 14/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 25/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 9w/e 08/02/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 14/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/11/1948 Darlington Works The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's.
It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7215
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25086
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77215    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90189    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
14/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90189    
03/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev