Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7218 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77218 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90190 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25089
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Thu 10/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
MEX   Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
41F   Mexborough w/e 26/01/1963
41D   Canklow w/e 07/03/1964
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 25/07/1964
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 16/01/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 09/10/1965
40B   Immingham w/e 01/01/1966
     Withdrawn on 10/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLS Hull Springhead on 14/03/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 25/10/1962
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 3w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 3w/e 25/07/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 40B Immingham 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   on 10/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7218
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25089
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77218    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90190    
26/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
10/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90190    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev