Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 63 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4978 Week
» 16215 Month
» 249135 Year
» 1914511 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7220 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77220 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3014 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63014 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90014 on 14/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25091
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Mon 24/04/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1967 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
NEV   Neville Hill w/e 16/04/1949
NPT   Newport (Teeside) w/e 13/08/1949
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
51A   Darlington w/e 18/06/1960
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/03/1966
     Withdrawn on 24/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 11/12/1945
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 30/03/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 16/04/1949
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 51A Darlington 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/03/1966
WDN   on 24/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/09/1964 Darlington MPD (Shed) On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7220
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25091
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77220    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3014    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63014 but not taken up    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
16/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
14/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90014    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
24/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90014    
07/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev