Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 853 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 22827 Month
» 200731 Year
» 1866107 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7221 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77221 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90191 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25092
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Fri 05/02/1960
Service Life 16 yrs, 5 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
31B   March 4w/e 14/12/1957
     Withdrawn on 05/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 06/03/1947
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   on 05/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7221
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25092
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77221    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90191    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 90191    
28/02/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev