Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 849 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2530 Week
» 22823 Month
» 200727 Year
» 1866103 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7225 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77225 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90193 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25096
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Mon 19/08/1963
Service Life 19 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Locomotive Works (Inverurie)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 14/07/1951
62A   Thornton Junction 4w/e 11/08/1962
     Withdrawn on 19/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/02/1948
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 14/02/1948
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 6w/e 18/08/1962
WDN   on 19/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   In L.N.E.R. Shops   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/05/1947 Eastfield MPD New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). SLS/194708
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710
10/10/1963 Inverurie Works (Scrapped) 42737, 42909, 45475, 65918. In Scrap Yard: 60819/27, 64627, 65253/341. Shopped four weeks ended 4/10-44724, 45066, 80126, D6148/50, D8031; Scrapped same period-45049, 60851/959, 64568, 65316, 90193, 90536/42. SLS/196311

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7225
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25096
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77225    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90193    
14/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
19/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90193    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev