Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7226 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77226 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90194 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25097
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/03/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
91M   To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1950
6B   Mold Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951
26D   Bury 4w/e 29/12/1951
26E   Lees (Oldham) w/e 17/12/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 21/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction w/e 06/10/1951
LOAN 24A Accrington w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   w/e 21/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
20/05/1951 Locos renumbered S.R. 2170 was renumbered 32170 in mid-May, and diesel sl will shortly be turned out as 15201. Thus the S.R. diesels have become 15201-15203 instead of 15200-15202 as originally ordained. The Southern Region has lost two more W.D., 2-8-0 to the L.M.R., 90226 from 73B and 90390 from 73C. No. 77150 has now become 90142, so that all remaining on the S.R. are now renumbered with the possible exception of 77226 (90194). SLS/195107
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
23/07/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D110-2, 42121, 42235, 42579, 42658/9/77, 44987, 45224, 45415/35, 45588, 49395. Outside Paint Shop: D108/13-5, 45658. Works Sidings: 40580, 42377, 42481, 42507, 42602, 44148/75, 44728/66/79, 44824, 44929/49, 45005, 45247, 45445, 45516/44, 45610/30, 46110/35, 47277, 48154, 49049, 90194, 90323, 90621, 92096. Erecting Shop: D116-21, D269, 41229/68, 42158, 42218, 42562/89, 42610, 44374, 44658/85/6, 44821/71/88, 45045/75, 45104/85/99, 45218/48/54/96, 45333/45/73, 45529/89, 45611/8/9/61/72, 46102/31/55, 46243, 46441, 48287, 48393, 48446, 48697, 48732/61/7, 90264, 90327/81, 90646/58, 92030/2/72/7. Outside Erecting Shop: 42086, 42234, 42652, 44687, 45189, 45410, 46142. New Erecting Shop: D76, D122-8, D331, D5142. Outside New Erecting Shop: D5078. Scrap Yard: 43268, 43962, 47418, 58305 intact, 41529 just cut up. Works Shunters: 12071, 42984, 43957, 47618, 51412/44/6, 52093, 52312, 52441/59. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7226
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25097
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77226    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90194    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
17/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
21/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90194    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev