Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 845 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2526 Week
» 22819 Month
» 200723 Year
» 1866099 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7227 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77227 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90195 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25098
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 03/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 08/11/1947
36A   Doncaster w/e 25/08/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 03/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 08/11/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 25/08/1962
WDN   w/e 03/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/10/1965 Doncaster Shed (Stored) Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. SLS/196511

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7227
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25098
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77227    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90195    
25/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
03/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90195    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev