Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 805 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2486 Week
» 22779 Month
» 200683 Year
» 1866059 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7228 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77228 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90196 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25099
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Wed 05/09/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 19/11/1947
33A   Plaistow 3w/e 14/05/1955
33B   Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 05/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 19/11/1947
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 05/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7228
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25099
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77228    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90196    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
05/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90196    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev