Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 852 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4365 Week
» 24658 Month
» 202562 Year
» 1867938 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7229 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77229 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90197 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25100
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Slag Reduction Co. (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/09/1951
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 11/06/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7229
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25100
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77229    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90197    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90197    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Slag Reduction Co.: Ickles    

prev prev