Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 841 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2522 Week
» 22815 Month
» 200719 Year
» 1866095 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7230 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77230 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90198 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25101
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
65D   Dawsholm 8w/e 31/08/1957
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 02/08/1958
61A   Kittybrewster 4w/e 24/02/1962
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 24/03/1962
67D   Ardrossan 4w/e 21/04/1962
67C   Ayr 4w/e 21/04/1962
     Withdrawn on 17/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DEE Dundee Tay Bridge on 19/04/1947
LOAN 31A St Rollox (Balornock) w/e 11/09/1948
EXLOAN DEE Dundee Tay Bridge on 29/10/1948
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 10/03/1962
ALLOC 67D Ardrossan 4w/e 07/04/1962
ALLOC 67C Ayr 5w/e 12/05/1962
WDN   on 17/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines due into Works, July 1950: 61754/71, 1931, 61983, 62208, 62424, 4549/61, 67605/67, 68324, 8450, 69187, 69219, 77230, 90262, 90498. SLS/195010

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7230
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25101
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77230    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90198    
31/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardrossan (67D)    
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ayr (67C)    
17/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90198    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev