Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 764 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6164 Week
» 24216 Month
» 257136 Year
» 1922512 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7231 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77231 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90199 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25102
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Thu 24/11/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1967 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
62A   Thornton Junction 4w/e 07/08/1954
65F   Grangemouth 4w/e 29/10/1955
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 02/08/1958
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963
65F   Grangemouth 4w/e 30/11/1963
62C   Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 25/12/1965
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DFU Dunfermline Upper on 22/09/1947
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 07/08/1954
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 29/10/1955
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper w/e 04/12/1965
WDN   on 24/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 60152, 61072, 61117/18, 61307, 1751, 61764, 1780, 61784, 2474/76/88, 2684/94, 62733, 3058, 3168, 64575, 4586, 64621/28/36, 4786, 64877/80, 4919/40, 65923, 5924, 65932, 7453/80, 68100, 8323/44, 9170, 9214, 9507, 69595, 90505, ex-W.D. 77089, 77231, 73792. SLS/195003
01/05/1965 Cowlairs Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop: 42138/693, 44727/92, 44845/949/91/7, 45034/54/115/82/390, 76050, 73053/100, 80122, 90199; Outside: 45012/28, 45403/51, 73151, 76024. SLS/196506

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7231
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25102
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77231    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90199    
07/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
29/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
24/11/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90199    
05/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick    

prev prev