Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 852 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4365 Week
» 24658 Month
» 202562 Year
» 1867938 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7232 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77232 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90200 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25103
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Sat 01/07/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
YK   York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
51A   Darlington 3w/e 16/06/1956
50A   York (North) w/e 31/01/1959
56A   Wakefield w/e 07/11/1959
56F   Low Moor w/e 14/11/1959
56E   Sowerby Bridge w/e 17/06/1961
56A   Wakefield w/e 11/01/1964
52G   Sunderland 4w/e 10/09/1966
     Withdrawn on 01/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN IMM Immingham on 17/03/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 05/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 56E Sowerby Bridge 5w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 10/09/1966
WDN   on 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7232
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25103
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77232    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90200    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
14/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
10/09/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
01/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90200    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev