Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 799 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4312 Week
» 24605 Month
» 202509 Year
» 1867885 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7233 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77233 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3021 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63021 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90021 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25104
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
ANN   Annesley w/e 07/02/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 17/04/1948
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates m/e 12/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
50A   York (North) 5w/e 17/12/1955
51A   Darlington 3w/e 16/06/1956
50A   York (North) 5w/e 20/07/1957
55E   Normanton 4w/e 21/09/1957
     Withdrawn on 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 29/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 30/03/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 17/04/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7233
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25104
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77233    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3021    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63021 but not taken up    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
17/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90021    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90021    
03/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev