Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 23 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1933 Week
» 2872 Month
» 206362 Year
» 1871738 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7234 m/e 10/1943
War Dept. 77234 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90201 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25105
To Service During 10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 11/07/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Garrex Metals (Rochdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1943
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 12/08/1950
86E   Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 31/08/1950
86C   Cardiff Canton 8w/e 26/03/1955
81E   Didcot 4w/e 25/03/1961
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 15/07/1961
9G   Gorton on 20/05/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 11/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STB Stourbridge Junction m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC OXY Oxley m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 25/03/1961
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 15/07/1961
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 02/06/1962
WDN   w/e 11/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Swindon Works New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48.
No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear.
SLS/194905
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
08/04/1962 Crewe Works (Works Yard) New Erecting Shop: D52 (Complete), D1037-9 (Body shells), D231/94/5, D8015, E3020. New Erecting Shop Yard: D303, 42640. Erecting Shop: D53-5 (Engines in), D56/7, D1035/6 (Body Sides only), D7, D212/3/5/7/26/92, D325, D8005, 41225/39/41, 42102/5/33/5, 42249/96, 42555/6, 42644/86, 44741, 44815, 44911, 45134, 45202/10/24/31/62, 45375, 45557/71/90/1/9, 45632/3/54, 45742, 46111/22/9, 46238, 48452, 48504, 70015/20/51, 92045, 92120. Erecting Shop Yard: D335, D8019, 42586, 45097, 45370, 45434, 46132/45/56, 46222/39/42, 78013. Paint Shop: D50/1/64-7, 45242, 46240, 49395, 90606 and an unidentified electric loco. Paint Shop Yard: D235, 90178. Works Yard: 42256, 42494, 42514, 44778, 44862, 44932/64, 45535, 45671, 46118/48, 48600, 70014, 90167, 90201, 90520, 92022/46/54. Scrap Road: 40024, 40132, 41900, 46204/11/2, 49134 complete with 40180, 45519, 51222 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 43957, 44363/73, 47592, 47618/61, 51412, 52093, 52312, 52441, D3245. SLS/196205

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7234
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25105
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77234    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90201    
12/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
25/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
15/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
20/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
11/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90201    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Garrex Metals: Rochdale    

prev prev